Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Coakley-Rivera, Cheryl, Potter, Judith, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Alekman, Esq., Ryan E, Choi, Esq., Chelsea Kim, Ditusa, Esq., Robert A, Kenefick, Iii, Esq., Thomas Aquinas, Mangini, Esq., Laura, (total of 6) See All against Bello, John, Carey, Paula, Gladstone, Carol, O'Brien, Charles, represented by Fischer-Groban, Esq., Phoebe, Green, Esq., Julie Elisabeth, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wrenn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wrenn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs, all appellate rights waived as to Paula Carey In Official Capacity Chief Justice of Administration and Management, John Bello In Official Capacity Court Administrator of the Massachusetts Trial Courts, Charles O'Brien In Official Capacity Director of Facilities Management and Capital Planning Department Of The Trial Court, Carol Gladstone In Official Capacity Commissioner of the Division of Capital Asset Management, Cheryl Coakley-Rivera Individually and in his/her capacity Registrar of Deeds, Judith Potter's original complaint | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER sent for Status Review, if notice is not received by 01/12/2023 the complaint will be dismissed. Judge: Yarashus, Hon. Valerie A | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled on: 09/20/2021 09:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Daniel M Wrenn, Presiding Staff: Cheryl Riddle, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Wrenn, Daniel M |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendants Paula Carey In Official Capacity Chief Justice of Administration and Management, John Bello In Official Capacity Court Administrator of the Massachusetts Trial Courts, Charles O'Brien In Official Capacity Director of Facilities Management and Capital Planning Department Of The Trial Court, Carol Gladstone In Official Capacity Commissioner of the Division of Capital Asset Management's Submission of Statement on Jurisdictional Issues (E-FILED) | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM & ORDER: ON PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE AND EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND/OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION- ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, it is ORDERED that the plaintiffs' ex parte and emergency motion for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction is DENIED insofar as the plaintiffs seek a court order closing the courthouse. Entered and Copies mailed 9/13/21 Judge: Wrenn, Hon. Daniel M | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Phoebe Fischer-Groban, Esq. added for Defendant Charles O'Brien In Official Capacity Director of Facilities Management and Capital Planning Department Of The Trial Court | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Phoebe Fischer-Groban, Esq. added for Defendant John Bello In Official Capacity Court Administrator of the Massachusetts Trial Courts | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Phoebe Fischer-Groban, Esq. added for Defendant Paula Carey In Official Capacity Chief Justice of Administration and Management | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Phoebe Fischer-Groban, Esq. added for Defendant Carol Gladstone In Official Capacity Commissioner of the Division of Capital Asset Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.