Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of America N.A., Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pisaturo, Esq., Michael Joseph, against Millona, Alma, Millona, Arian, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Janet Kenton-Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet Kenton-Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Complaint electronically filed.
Date: September 02, 2021Plaintiff Bank of America N.A.'s Request to Reissue Summons (E-FILED)
Date: July 06, 2022Service Returned for Applies To: Millona, Arian (Defendant)
Date: June 28, 2023Service Returned for Arian Millona; Service made in hand on 7/20/22 (E-FILED)
Date: July 21, 2022Plaintiff Bank of America N.A.'s Motion to transfer civil action to District Court (E-FILED)
Date: December 09, 2022Service Returned for Alma Millona; service made at last and usual on 09/28/2022 (E-FILED)
Date: October 11, 2022Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Applies To: Millona, Arian (Defendant) | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Pleading titled, Proof of Service (Arian Millona), filed with the court on 06/28/2023, returned to Matthew Poletti (Burke Moore Law Group), 235 Peachtree St NE, Suite 1900, Atlanta Georgia 30308 via mail on 7/5/23 Duplicate filing; Case has been transferred to another Court. | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to transfer civil action to District Court (#11.0): ALLOWED The Case shall be transferred to East Brookfield District Court . e-document sent 12/22/2022. | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER: TO TRANSFER It id ORDERED and ADJUDGED: That the above titled action be transferred to East Brookfield District Court (see order) Entered and mailed 12/22/2022. | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Case transferred to another court. | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Bank of America N.A.'s Motion to transfer civil action to District Court (E-FILED) | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Default (1-88): Defendants Millona, Arian; and Alma Millona: Defaulted under time standards; the plaintiff shall file a request for default judgment (sum certain) by 12/14/22 or the complaint shall be dismissed. | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Bank of America N.A.'s Request for Default (E-FILED) Applies To: Millona, Arian (Defendant); Millona, Alma (Defendant) | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Alma Millona; service made at last and usual on 09/28/2022 (E-FILED) | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | INCOMPLETE Service Returned for Alma Millona; service made at last and usual by leaving with Arian Milona (Service cannot be accepted on behalf of another individual) (E-FILED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.