Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Label, Janet M., The Trucking Company, Inc., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Francis, Esq., Thomas S, Wecker, Esq., Ross C, against Adams Equipment Refinishing, Inc., Arbella Protection Insurance Company, Lebel, Janet M., Safety Insurance, represented by Farrey Iii, Thomas B, Francis, Esq., Thomas S, Smith, Esq., Janet M, Sullivan, Esq., Deborah S, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Valerie A. Yarashus presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValerie A. Yarashus Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Complaint electronically filed.
Date: May 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend the tracking order discovery deadline and all remaining tracking order deadlines (#23.0): ALLOWED e-document sent 03/20/2023 Judge: Yarashus, Hon. Valerie A | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 07/27/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Comments: Motion to amend P#23, Allowed. Hon. Karin Bell, Presiding Staff: Anne O'Connor, Assistant Clerk
Judge: Bell, Karin |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 03/20/2023 16:18:36 | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Janet M. Lebel's Assented to Motion to Extend the Tracking Order Discovery Deadline and All Remaining Tracking Order Deadlines [E-FILED] | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 11/04/2022 15:20:47 | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend the tracking order discovery deadline and all remaining tracking order deadlines (#21.0): ALLOWED The tracking order is extended as follows: Discovery: 01/21/2023 Rule 56 Served: 02/28/2023 Rule 56 Filed: 03/31/2023 FPTC: 07/27/2023 at 2:00PM The Parties should not anticipate further extensions absent extraordinary circumstances. e-document sent 11/08/2022 | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to amend caption of the case (assented to) (#22.0): ALLOWED e-document sent 11/08/2022 Judge: Bell, Hon. Karin
Judge: Bell, Karin |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Party status: Defendant Arbella Mutual Insurance Company: Inactive; | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Deborah S Sullivan, Esq. added for Defendant Arbella Protection Insurance Company | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Janet M. Lebel's Assented to Motion to Extend the tracking order discovery deadline and all remaining tacking order deadlines (E-FILED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.