Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pelletier, Elisabeth, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Devlin, Esq., Ryan A, Vlassakis, Esq., John M, against Basile, Kenneth, Mark'S Transportation, Llc, represented by Farrey Iii, Thomas B, Puccio, Jr., Esq., Frank S, Seliger, Esq., Brooke, Smith, Esq., Janet M, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Sharon E. Donatelle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSharon E. Donatelle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice as to Elisabeth Pelletier's original complaint
Date: January 24, 2020Rule 9A notice of filing (RE: p. 25-32)
Date: July 02, 2019General correspondence regarding Agreed upon statement to be read to the jury
Date: December 03, 2019General correspondence regarding Plaintiff Proposed Jury instructions ( Filed in court )
Date: December 03, 2019Plaintiff Elisabeth Pelletier's Motion for Voir Dire ( Filed in court )
Date: December 03, 2019Plaintiff Elisabeth Pelletier's Motion to Continue Trial (Unopposed)
Date: July 30, 2019Certificate of Compliance Superior Court Rule 9A
Date: July 02, 2019Rule 9A list of documents filed.
Date: July 02, 2019Plaintiff Elisabeth Pelletier's Assented to Motion to Continue Trial
Date: June 17, 2019Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: March 26, 2018Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking order deadlines (#21.0): ALLOWED
Date: July 24, 2017Original civil complaint filed.
Date: October 06, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice as to Elisabeth Pelletier's original complaint | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 12/09/2019 09:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. William M White, Jr., Presiding Staff: Cheryl Riddle, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: William M White, Jr. |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: John M Vlassakis, Esq. Attorney: Ryan A Devlin, Esq. Attorney: Brooke Seliger, Esq. Attorney: Frank S Puccio, Jr., Esq. Attorney: Janet M Bolger, Esq. Attorney: Thomas B Farrey III | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 01/06/2020 | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation Now come the parties in the above entitled action and herby stipulate that the plaintiff, Elisabeth Pelletier, will be making no claim for psychological injury, emotional suffering, or psychological/emotional distress as a result of the automobile accident of June 9,2014. The parties further stipulate that Elisabeth Pelletier will not present any testimony relating to emotional suffering, psychological injury or psychological/emotional distress at the trial/hearing of this matter. The parties also stipulate that any medical records which Elisabeth Pelletier intends to submit at trial will be redacted to exclude/omit any statements relating to the plaintiffs emotional or psychological condition following the accident of June 9, 2014. ( Filed in court ) Applies To: Pelletier, Elisabeth (Plaintiff) | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion in Limine to exclude testimony and report of plaintiffs Proposed expert witness Dr. Christopher Gilligan (#30.0): Withdrawn | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Agreed upon statement to be read to the jury | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Plaintiff Proposed Jury instructions ( Filed in court ) | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Opposition to of Defendants Kenneth Basile and Marks Transportation LLC to portions of Plaintiffs Proposed areas of Inquiry for attorney Voir Dire Re # 37 filed by ( Filed in court ) | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Elisabeth Pelletier's Motion for Voir Dire ( Filed in court ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.