Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fong, Lin, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gordon, Esq., Stephen J, against Dashevsky, Steve, Webster Light Llc, represented by Von Timroth, Esq., Vladimir, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Diane C. Freniere presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane C. Freniere Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 18, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedMay 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT of Dismissal: Failure to comply with nisi order. Judge: Freniere, Hon Diane Entered and Copies mailed 1/31/18 Judge: Freniere, Hon Diane
Judge: Freniere, Hon Diane |
|
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Stephen J Gordon, Esq. Defendant: Steve Dashevsky Attorney: Vladimir von Timroth, Esq. Attorney: Vladimir von Timroth, Esq. | |
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 01/29/2018 Judge: Campo, Hon. Anthony M.
Judge: Anthony M.Campo |
|
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 11/02/2017 11:45:45 | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Extend Discovery and Rule 56 Motion Deadlines (#6.0): ALLOWED Tracking order amended. Notices mailed 5/5/17 | |
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant Steve Dashevsky Doing Business as Dashevsky Health Care and Webster Light, LLC, Webster Light LLC's Assented to Motion to Extend Discovery and Rule 56 Motion Deadlines | |
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Vladimir von Timroth, Esq. added for Defendant Webster Light LLC | |
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Vladimir von Timroth, Esq. added for Defendant Steve Dashevsky Doing Business as Dashevsky Health Care | |
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Webster Light LLC: Answer to original complaint; CJ | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Webster Light LLC: Service through person in charge / agent; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.