Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
St. Laurent, Donald, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Hoyt, Esq., David E, against Piwowarczyk, Rafal, represented by Rushton, Esq., Frederick C, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with David Ricciardone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Ricciardone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 18, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Plaintiff Donald St. Laurent's Assented to Motion to continue Rule 16 Conference
Date: July 29, 2019Opposition to to paper # 12 filed by Donald St. Laurent exhibits NOT scanned
Date: April 06, 2018Affidavit of Rafal Piwowarczyk
Date: April 06, 2018Original civil complaint filed.
Date: July 18, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal of all causes of action, all counts and all complaints herein Applies To: St. Laurent, Donald (Plaintiff); Rafal Piwowarczyk Doing Business as Tri-State Construction Co. (Defendant) | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 11/09/2021 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. David Ricciardone, Presiding Staff: Gail Dempsey, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ricciardone, David |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 10/04/2021 14:33:10 Notice Sent To: David E Hoyt, Esq. Law Office David E Hoyt PC 339 Main St Suite 501, Worcester, MA 01608 Notice Sent To: Frederick C Rushton, Esq. Law Office of Frederick Rushton 74 Elm St, Worcester, MA 01609 | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 02/04/2020 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. David Ricciardone, Presiding Staff: Gail Dempsey, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ricciardone, David |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Rule 16 Conference scheduled on: 08/29/2019 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: FTR Room 19 Hon. William J Ritter, Presiding Staff: Gregory Benoit, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Gail Dempsey, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ritter, William J |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 08/29/2019 14:33:02 | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 07/30/2019 11:08:32 | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Continue Rule 16 Conference (#15.0): ALLOWED notices mailed 07/30/2019 Judge: Ritter, Hon. William J
Judge: William JRitter |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Rule 16 Conference scheduled on: 08/01/2019 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. William J Ritter, Presiding Staff: Gregory Benoit, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Gail Dempsey, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ritter, William J |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Donald St. Laurent's Assented to Motion to continue Rule 16 Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.