Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Rybak, Cidalia, Rybak, Cidalia D, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Ferreira, Esq., Suzette A, against Chandra Ummethala, Sarat, Deguglielmo, Sharon, Theodore, James, represented by Feinberg Albright, Esq., Judith M, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Shannon Frison presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShannon Frison Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 18, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Defendant Sarat Chandra Ummethala's Request for Hearing (Revised)
Date: May 16, 2018Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike Interrogatories filed by Cidalia D Rybak
Date: February 15, 2018Original civil complaint filed.
Date: July 18, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT for failure to file bond G.L. c231 s. 60B, complaint is dismissed as to Sarat Chandra Ummethala. Entered and notices mailed 10/31/2019 | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice to Division of Professional Licensure of Tribunal Finding. | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Copies of findings mailed : 09/30/2019 | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | The medical malpractice tribunal made up of Hon. Peter B Krupp, James Theodore and Sharon Bryce DeGuglielmo, Esq., having met on 09/04/2019 09:00 AM Malpractice Tribunal reports that there is not sufficient evidence to raise a legitimate question as to liability appropriate for judicial inquiry. Applies To: Chandra Ummethala, Sarat (Defendant) | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Malpractice Tribunal scheduled on: 09/04/2019 09:00 AM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: held in Middlesex Hon. Shannon Frison, Presiding Staff: Anne O'Connor, Assistant Clerk
Judge: Frison, Shannon |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER for medical malpractice tribunal for Dentistry, in reference to Sarat Chandra Ummethala with Hon. Bruce R Henry presiding, James Theodore and Sharon Bryce DeGuglielmo, Esq.
Judge: Henry, Bruce R |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 04/22/2019 11:14:05 | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for medical malpractice tribunal filed by party for: Dentistry (Seventh Request) -Certificate of Service filed. Applies To: Chandra Ummethala, Sarat (Defendant) | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for medical malpractice tribunal filed by party for: Dentistry (Sixth Request) Applies To: Chandra Ummethala, Sarat (Defendant) | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Request for Hearing (Revised) (#38.0): DENIED after hearing. To the extent that the parties do not agree to be governed by Rule 73, the Court is unable to order the parties to a hearing on the offer of proof. Notices mailed 5/30/18 Judge: Frison, Hon. Shannon
Judge: Frison, Shannon |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.