Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sturbridge Hills Condominium Trust, filed a(n) Administrative Civil Actions case represented by Aylesworth, Esq., Thomas W, against Board Of Selectmen Of Sturbridge, represented by Mcenaney, Esq., Thomas William, Monahan, Esq., Joshua D, Weisheit, Esq., A. Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wrenn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wrenn Track Judgeโs New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2016 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Party(s) file Stipulation with prejudice and without costs with all rights of appeal waived. Notices mailed : 12/11/2017 Applies To: Sturbridge Hills Condominium Trust (Plaintiff); Board of Selectmen of Sturbridge In Official Capacity As Water and Sewer Commissioners and Board of Selectmen of Sturbridge (Defendant); Board of Selectmen of Sturbridge In Official Capacity Water and Sewer Commissioners (Defendant); Board of Selectmen of Sturbridge (Defendant); Aylesworth, Esq., Thomas W (Attorney) on behalf of Sturbridge Hills Condominium Trust (Plaintiff); McEnaney, Esq., Thomas William (Attorney) on behalf of Board of Selectmen of Sturbridge (Defendant); Weisheit, Esq., A. Alexander (Attorney) on behalf of Board of Selectmen of Sturbridge (Defendant); Bielan, Esq., Kimberly (Attorney) on behalf of Sturbridge Hills Condominium Trust (Plaintiff); Monahan, Esq., Joshua D (Attorney) on behalf of Board of Selectmen of Sturbridge (Defendant); Event Judge: Wrenn, Hon. Daniel M
Judge: Daniel MWrenn |
|
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Thomas W Aylesworth, Esq. Attorney: Thomas William McEnaney, Esq. Attorney: A. Alexander Weisheit, Esq. Attorney: Joshua D Monahan, Esq. | |
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 12/26/2017 Entered and copies mailed : 11/08/2017 Judge: Wrenn, Hon. Daniel M
Judge: Daniel MWrenn |
|
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Wrenn, Hon. Daniel M The following event: Motion Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Not Held Reason: Case Settled
Judge: Wrenn, Daniel M |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 09/29/2017 11:35:18 | |
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Motion Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: By Court prior to date | |
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Defendants Opposition to plaintiffs proposed judgment | |
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 09/20/2017 13:46:53 | |
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 09/20/2017 13:45:55 | |
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendants Emergency Motion to Extend Deadline to File Proposed Form of Judgement (P#14) filed by Sturbridge Hills Condominium Trust |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.