Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Isgro, Carmelo, Isgro, Linda, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Dicenzo, Esq., Andrew P, Wojcik, Esq., David Albin, against Driscoll, Daniel, Driscoll, Jennifer, represented by Kiritsy, Esq., George P, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Karen L. Goodwin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren L. Goodwin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Original civil complaint filed. Exhibits filed. Exhibits not scanned.
Date: July 15, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice and without costs. The parties also waive all rights of appeal and shall bear their own costs. (Joint) Notices sent on 02/27/18 Applies To: Isgro, Carmelo (Plaintiff); Isgro, Linda (Plaintiff); Daniel Driscoll Individually and as trustee of The Driscoll Family Trust (Defendant); Jennifer Driscoll Individually and as trustee of The Driscoll Family Trust (Defendant) | |
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: David Albin Wojcik, Esq. Attorney: Andrew P DiCenzo, Esq. Attorney: David Albin Wojcik, Esq. Attorney: Andrew P DiCenzo, Esq. Attorney: George P Kiritsy, Esq. Attorney: George P Kiritsy, Esq. | |
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 02/12/2018 Judge: Goodwin, Hon. Karen
Judge: Goodwin, Karen |
|
August 29, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 08/29/2017 08:39:37 | |
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Conference to Review Status scheduled for 08/25/2017 08:30 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: By Court prior to date | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Isgro, Linda: Answer to the Counterclaim; | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Isgro, Carmelo: Answer to the Counterclaim; | |
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Counterclaim filed. Applies To: Isgro, Carmelo (Defendant); Isgro, Linda (Defendant); Daniel Driscoll Individually and as trustee of The Driscoll Family Trust (Plaintiff); Jennifer Driscoll Individually and as trustee of The Driscoll Family Trust (Plaintiff) | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (#3.0): Other action taken Preliminary Injunction to issue upon payment of $90.00 for issuance of Preliminary Injunction. | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date George P Kiritsy, Esq. added for Defendant Jennifer Driscoll Individually and as trustee of The Driscoll Family Trust |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.