Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Workers' Compensation Trust Fund, filed a(n) Workers Compensation - Labor and Employment case represented by Michels, Esq., David, Toole, Esq., Janice Lenczycki, against Nwogbo, Stella L., Steben International Transportation And Business Group Inc., represented by Boahene, Esq., Peter O, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with James Gavin Reardon, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Gavin Reardon, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2016 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedMay 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeWorkers Compensation |
Plaintiff Workers' Compensation Trust Fund's Motion for Assessment of Damages
Date: June 01, 2018Plaintiff Workers' Compensation Trust Fund's Motion for Assessment of Damages
Date: March 28, 2018Plaintiff Workers' Compensation Trust Fund's Motion for Assessment of Damages
Date: March 05, 2018Original civil complaint filed.
Date: July 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Execution Issued: Execution Judgment Debtor: Steben International Transportation and Business Group Inc. / Nwogbo, Stella L. Judgment Creditor: Workers' Compensation Trust Fund Terms of Execution: EXON Issuance Date: 01/04/2019 Judgment Total: 82,417.07 Post Judgment Costs: 140.77 Post Judgment Int. Rate: .12 Post Judgment Int. Total: 5,423.04 Execution Subtotal: 87,840.11 Execution Total: 87,980.88 | |
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for execution Applies To: Workers' Compensation Trust Fund (Plaintiff) | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)2 After Hearing Presiding: Hon. James G Reardon, Jr. Judgment For: Workers' Compensation Trust Fund Judgment Against: Steben International Transportation and Business Group Inc. Stella L. Nwogbo Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 07/14/2016 Jdgmnt Date: 06/18/2018 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 66917.83 Judgment Total: 82,417.07 | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Assessment of Damages (#10.0): ALLOWED Allowed after hearing. Notices mailed 6/18/18 Judge: Reardon, Jr., Hon. James G
Judge: Jr., James GReardon Jr. |
|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled on: 06/14/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: FTR - 2:20pm Hon. James G Reardon, Jr., Presiding Appeared: Staff: Laurie Jurgiel, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: James G Reardon, Jr. |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Workers' Compensation Trust Fund's Motion for Assessment of Damages | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Reardon, Jr., Hon. James G The following event: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: By Court prior to date
Judge: Jr., James G The following event: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: By Court prior to dateReardon Jr. |
|
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Reardon, Jr., Hon. James G The following event: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: By Court prior to date
Judge: Jr., James G The following event: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: By Court prior to dateReardon Jr. |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Workers' Compensation Trust Fund's Motion for Assessment of Damages | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Defendant Stella L. Nwogbo is not in the Military |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.