Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Kasparian, Jennah, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gentile, Esq., Cherele L, Hughes, Esq., Roland D, against Gardner, Mary, represented by Anderson, Esq., Stephen R, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice and without costs Applies To: Kasparian, Jennah (Plaintiff); Gardner, Mary (Defendant) | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 05/04/2018 09:46:03 | |
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Roland D Hughes, Esq. added for Plaintiff Jennah Kasparian | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER issued on application (#11.0) to allow Stephen R Anderson, Esq. to inspect hospital records regarding Jennah Kasparian (DOB 05/10/1983) from Walgreen's Pharmacy. Certified copy to Attorney Anderson 1/18/17 | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER issued on application (#11.0) to allow Stephen R Anderson, Esq. to inspect hospital records regarding Jennah Kasparian (DOB 05/10/1983) from Prabhasadanam G. Sadhujan, M.D.. Certified copy to Attorney Anderson 1/18/17 | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER issued on application (#11.0) to allow Stephen R Anderson, Esq. to inspect hospital records regarding Jennah Kasparian (DOB 05/10/1983) from St. Vincent Hospital at Worcester Medical Center. Certified copy to Attorney Anderson 1/18/17 | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Order Release of Medical Records (#11.0): ALLOWED Notices mailed 1/18/17 | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A and Document Listing Applies To: Gardner, Mary (Defendant) | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant Mary Gardner's Statement of Reasons and Authorities in Support of Defendants Motion to Order Release of Medical Records | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant Mary Gardner's Motion to Order Release of Medical Records |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.