Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Ludwig, Esq., Glenn Allan, against $977.00, Casillas- Rivera, Harold, Cordova-Sanchez, Argenis, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2016 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) Applies To: Casillas- Rivera, Harold (Defendant)
Date: September 09, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Following an entry of Judgment by Default it is ordered that $977.00 be forfeited to Commonwealth of Massachusetts. as to Argenis Cordova-Sanchez only See attached entered and copies mailed 09/21/2016 | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for default judgment (#8.0): ALLOWED | |
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts's Motion for Default Judgment As to Argenis Cordova Sanchez Only | |
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Defendant Cordova-Sanchez, Argenis: Defaulted by 55(a) request; | |
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Defendant Argenis Cordova-Sanchez is not in the Military Applies To: Cordova-Sanchez, Argenis (Defendant) | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) Applies To: Casillas- Rivera, Harold (Defendant) | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Commonwealth of Massachusetts's request for Default 55(a) Affidavit in support Applies To: Cordova-Sanchez, Argenis (Defendant) | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Subject of Forfeiture Cordova-Sanchez, Argenis: Service via certified mail; | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint filed pursuant to G. L. c. 94C, ยง47 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.