Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Beaumont At The Willows, Llp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Carpenter, Esq., Thomas P, against Cavanaugh, Mary, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL (1-88) entered, service not completed for any party by deadline review. Applies To: Cavanaugh, Mary (Defendant) Entered and Copies Mailed 12/9/2016 | |
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Document: A Judgment of Dismissal 1-88 was generated and sent to: Attorney: Thomas P. Carpenter, Esq. | |
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons, returned INCOMPLETE an indivinual cannot accept service for another individual Applies To: Cavanaugh, Mary (Defendant) | |
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 07/11/2016 | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Thomas P. Carpenter, Esq. added for Plaintiff Beaumont at the Willows, LLP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.