Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Poirier, Kevin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Caprera, Esq., Robert G, against Sawyer, Laurence, represented by Mahoney, Esq., Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice and without costs Applies To: Poirier, Kevin (Plaintiff); Sawyer, Laurence (Defendant) | |
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Matthew Mahoney, Esq. added for Defendant Laurence Sawyer | |
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Default (1-88): Defendant Sawyer, Laurence: Defaulted under time standards; | |
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Sawyer, Laurence: Service made at last and usual place of abode. | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 07/08/2016 | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Robert G Caprera, Esq. added for Plaintiff Kevin Poirier |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.