Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Expose Yourself Public Relations, Inc., filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by White, Esq., Robert S, against Carrico, Gina, represented by Sinrich, Esq., Scott S, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wrenn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wrenn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 07, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Letters Rogatory Original issued to defendants counsel. Judge: Wrenn, Hon. Daniel M
Date: October 23, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal The parties stipulate that all claims and counterclaims be dismissed with prejudice, without costs, interest or attorneys' fees, and waiving all rights of appeal. Notices mailed on 4/3/18. Applies To: Expose Yourself Public Relations, Inc. (Plaintiff); Carrico, Gina (Defendant) | |
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letters Rogatory Original issued to defendants counsel. Judge: Wrenn, Hon. Daniel M
Judge: Daniel MWrenn |
|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Letter Rogatory (#13.0): ALLOWED Notices mailed 10/23/17. Judge: Wrenn, Hon. Daniel M
Judge: Daniel MWrenn |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. Applies To: Carrico, Gina (Defendant) | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing Applies To: Carrico, Gina (Defendant) | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Sinrich, Esq., Scott S (Attorney) on behalf of Carrico, Gina (Defendant) | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant Gina Carrico's Motion for Issuance of Letter Rogatory to take Deposition of Andrea Gity. | |
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Samuel Miller, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Plaintiff Expose Yourself Public Relations, Inc. | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER: granting leave to issue subpoena . Copies issued. | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on motion for deposition (#11.0): Upon review, ALLOWED Notices mailed 6/23/17,. Original order mailed to Atty. White. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.