Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sutherland Asset I Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rheaume, Esq., Alexander Gary, against Coderre Trustee Of School Street Trust, John, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT authorizing the foreclosure of a mortgage. Applies To: Coderre Trustee of School Street Trust, John (Defendant) Applies To: Sutherland Asset I LLC (Plaintiff); Coderre Trustee of School Street Trust, John (Defendant) | |
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Sutherland Asset I LLC's request for Default JUDGMENT 55(b)(1) Applies To: Coderre Trustee of School Street Trust, John (Defendant) | |
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Default: 55(a) re: Foreclosure Applies To: Coderre Trustee of School Street Trust, John (Defendant) | |
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Sutherland Asset I LLC's request for Default 55(a) Applies To: Coderre Trustee of School Street Trust, John (Defendant) | |
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | other document, returned SERVED Applies To: Coderre Trustee of School Street Trust, John (Defendant) | |
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Defendant John Coderre Trustee of School Street Trust is not in the Military | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice to publish foreclosure in the Winchendon Courtier rec notice in the Worcester District Registry of Deeds and by regular mail, return at Worcester 08/16/2016 (Tucker, J RAJ) | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for supplemental Order of Notice (#3.0): ALLOWED | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Sutherland Asset I LLC's EMERGENCY Motion for Supplemental Order of Notice | |
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice to publish foreclosure in the Winchendon Courier rec notice in the Worcester District Registry of Deeds and by regular mail, return at Worcester 08/16/2016 (Tucker, J RAJ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.