Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Maynard, Donna, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Christensen, Esq., Matthew Thorpe, against Abc Supply Co. Inc., Castro, S. Landaverde, New Season Transport Corp., represented by Hassett, Esq., David F, Loftus, Iii, Esq., Patrick J, Lynch, Esq., Tara E, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal The parties stipulate that the matter including all cross claims, counterclaims be dismissed as to all parties with prejudice, without costs, and waiving all rights of appeal. Notices mailed on 7/30/18. Applies To: Maynard, Donna (Plaintiff); Castro, S. Landaverde (Defendant); ABC Supply Co. Inc. (Defendant); New Season Transport Corp. (Defendant) | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Service or in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute (#14.0): DENIED After hearing motion DENIED. Motion is untimely and outside tracking order with respect to Rule 12. Additionally, the court does not find that there is either a failure to prosecute or a clear record of delay, accordingly, the case will not be dismissed under Rule 14(b)(2). Notices mailed 8/28/17 | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Matter taken under advisement The following event: Rule 12 Hearing scheduled for 08/24/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held - Under advisement | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 06/26/2017 14:12:06 | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Tara E. Lynch, Esq. | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. Applies To: Castro, S. Landaverde (Defendant); New Season Transport Corp. (Defendant) | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Lynch, Esq., Tara E. (Attorney) on behalf of Castro, S. Landaverde, New Season Transport Corp. (Defendant) | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for hearing filed Plaintiff's Request (Re:14) Applies To: Maynard, Donna (Plaintiff) | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for hearing filed Defendants' Request (Re:14) Applies To: Castro, S. Landaverde (Defendant); New Season Transport Corp. (Defendant) | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendants S. Landaverde Castro, New Season Transport Corp.'s Reply, Memorandum to Plaintiff, Donna Maynard's Opposition to their Motion to Dismiss. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.