Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Ludwig, Esq., Glenn Allan, against $764.00, Coello, Enrique, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2016 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Following an entry of Judgment by Default it is ordered that $764.00 be forfeited to Commonwealth of Massachusetts. Entered and Copies mailed 8/2/16 | |
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Default Judgment (#6.0): ALLOWED Notices mailed 8/2/16 | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts's Motion for Default Judgment | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Defendant Coello, Enrique: Defaulted by 55(a) request; | |
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Document: A Default order Mass. R. Civ. P. 55(a) was generated and sent to: Plaintiff: Glenn Allan Ludwig, Esq. Defendant: $764.00 | |
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Document: Default order Mass. R. Civ. P. 55(a) Sent On: 07/27/2016 15:00:56 | |
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Defendant Enrique Coello is not in the Military | |
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit filed by Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts in support of | |
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Commonwealth of Massachusetts's request for Default 55(a) Applies To: Coello, Enrique (Defendant) | |
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Coello, Enrique: Service via certified mail; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.