Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Morales, Jose R, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case represented by Pro Se, against Dinardo, Karen, Marchilli, Raymond, Patterson, Jason, Turco, Thomas A, represented by Sultan, Esq., Bradley A, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wrenn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wrenn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 17 |
CategoryCivil Actions With Incarcerated Party |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Appeal (#59.0): Other action taken After review of the pleadings and following a hearing, the defendants motion is ALLOWED for the reasons stated in defendants memorandum & defendants opposition to plaintiffs motion to strike (#62) Notices mailed : 05/10/2019 | |
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Strike defendants Motion to dismiss (#61.0): DENIED for the reasons stated in defendants memorandum (#62) Notices mailed : 05/10/2019 | |
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 05/02/2019 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Janet Kenton-Walker, Presiding Staff: Cheryl Riddle, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Matter taken under advisement: Rule 12 Hearing scheduled on: 05/02/2019 02:00 PM Has been: Held - Under advisement Comments: FTR - 2:05pm Hon. Janet Kenton-Walker, Presiding Staff: Cheryl Riddle, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Jose R Morales's Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as Requested by the Court on March 22, 2019, with Notice mailed April 2, 2019. (RE: p. 59) (Certificate of Service attached) | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Opposition to the Plaintiff's Motion to Strike filed by Thomas A Turco Commissioner of Department of Corrections, Raymond Marchilli In Official Capacity Superintendent of NCCI Gardner, Karen Dinardo In Official Capacity Deputy Superintendent NCCI Gardner, Jason Patterson In Official Capacity Grievance Coordinator at NCCI Gardner (RE: p. 61) (Certificate of Service attached) | |
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum (#60.0): ALLOWED notices mailed 04/02/2019 | |
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Jose R Morales's Motion to Strike Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Appeal or in the Alternative Impound and Purge all Plaintiff's Financial Information Contained in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Appeal (Certificate of Service attached) | |
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Habeas corpus issued as to Jose R Morales at Massachusetts Treatment Center - Bridgewater for 05/02/2019 02:00 PM Conference to Review Status. | |
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Appeal (#59.0): Other action taken Plaintiff has 45 days to respond. notices mailed 04/02/2019 Judge: Sullivan, Hon. William F
Judge: William FSullivan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.