Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Gentilella, Janelle, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Berg, Esq., Charles E, Ellis, Esq., Nicholas James, against Latham, Janet A., Maki, Virginia L., represented by Welsh, Esq., Brian F, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Elaine M. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine M. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Plaintiff Janelle Gentilella's Motion to Allow Attorney-Conducted Voir Dire
Date: January 29, 2018Defendants Janet A. Latham, Virginia L. Maki's Motion in Limine
Date: January 30, 2018Plaintiff Janelle Gentilella's Motion in Limine (First)
Date: January 29, 2018Original civil complaint filed.
Date: May 27, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Charles E Berg, Esq. added for Plaintiff Janelle Gentilella | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice and without costs, waiving all rights of appeal Copies mailed on 03/02/18 Applies To: Gentilella, Janelle (Plaintiff); Latham, Janet A. (Defendant) | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Nicholas James Ellis, Esq. Attorney: Brian F Welsh, Esq. | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 03/09/2018 Judge: Buckley, Hon. Elaine M
Judge: Elaine MBuckley |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Buckley, Hon. Elaine M The following event: Jury Trial scheduled for 02/07/2018 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Not Held Reason: Case Settled
Judge: Buckley, Elaine M |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Buckley, Hon. Elaine M The following event: Final Trial Conference scheduled for 02/01/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled
Judge: Buckley, Elaine M |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Court Recevied: Defendant's Jury Instructions | |
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Defendants Janet A. Latham, Virginia L. Maki's Motion in Limine | |
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Defendants Janet A. Latham, Virginia L. Maki's Motion in Limine to Redact Certain Information from the Plaintiff's Medical Records | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Janelle Gentilella's Motion to Allow Attorney-Conducted Voir Dire |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.