Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bay State Elevator Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Curtis, Esq., Jeffrey Paul, Heinzelman, Esq., Julie Brennan, against Building Blocks Construction Inc., Resurrection Real Estate Llc, represented by Gorman, Iii, Esq., Hugh J, Ponte, Esq., Adam Chin, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with David Ricciardone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Ricciardone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORDER: FINAL JUDGMENT- (See Judgment) Entered and Copies mailed 7/28/17
Date: July 28, 2017Original civil complaint filed.
Date: May 26, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Execution Issued: Execution Judgment Debtor: Building Blocks Construction Inc. Judgment Creditor: Resurrection Real Estate LLC Terms of Execution: EXON Issuance Date: 09/05/2017 Judgment Total: 48,603.57 Post Judgment Int. Rate: .12 Post Judgment Int. Total: 623.63 Execution Subtotal: 49,227.20 Execution Total: 49,227.20 | |
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Application for Issuance of Execution (#20.0): ALLOWED Notices mailed 9/5/17 | |
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff in a Crossclaim Resurrection Real Estate LLC's Application for Issuance of Execution Against Building Blocks Construction, Inc. | |
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER: FINAL JUDGMENT- (See Judgment) Entered and Copies mailed 7/28/17 | |
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)2 After Hearing Presiding: Hon. David Ricciardone Judgment For: Resurrection Real Estate LLC Judgment Against: Building Blocks Construction Inc. Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 06/14/2016 Jdgmnt Date: 07/28/2017 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 42839.10 Judgment Total: 48,603.57 | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Assessment of Damages and Default Judgment as to Building Blocks Construction Inc. (#15.0): ALLOWED After hearing, facts found as pled here and ALLOWED. Notices mailed 7/28/17 | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Michael Glick (Updated)- Filed in Court | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Andrew L Baldwin, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Defendant Resurrection Real Estate LLC | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Adam Chin Ponte, Esq. added for Defendant Resurrection Real Estate LLC | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.