Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Can Capital Asset Servicing Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Frisella, Esq., Amy Marie, against Auto Center Repair & Towing Inc., Diaz, Wendy, represented by Mcginty, Esq., Sean M, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: May 26, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment by Agreement. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED:: That by agreement the complaint of plaintiff Can Capital Asset Servicing, Inc. and the counterclaims of the defendants Auto Center Repair and Towing, Inc. and Wendy Diaz be and hereby are dismissed with prejudice. | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to dismiss complaint as well as the defendants' counterclaims with prejudice. (Joint Motion) (#8.0): ALLOWED | |
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Can Capital Asset Servicing Inc.'s Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Plaintiff Auto Center Repair & Towing Inc.: Answer to the Counterclaim; | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Counterclaim filed. Applies To: Can Capital Asset Servicing Inc. (Defendant); Auto Center Repair & Towing Inc. (Plaintiff); Diaz, Wendy (Plaintiff) | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Sean M McGinty, Esq. added for Defendant Wendy Diaz | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Sean M McGinty, Esq. added for Defendant Auto Center Repair & Towing Inc. | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Complaince filed by Plaintiff Counsel | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Auto Center Repair & Towing Inc.: Service through person in charge / agent; | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Diaz, Wendy: Service made at last and usual; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.