Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Windset Capital Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cohn, Esq., Lewis Jason, Rudolph, Esq., Alexander H, against Evancic, Geoffrey, Whipple Construction Inc, represented by White, Esq., Robert S, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Shannon Frison presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShannon Frison Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Plaintiff Windset Capital Corporation's Motion to Charge Trustee Defendant
Date: July 13, 2020Plaintiff Windset Capital Corporation's Motion to Charge Trustee Defendant
Date: October 29, 2020Plaintiff Windset Capital Corporation's Motion to Compel the Answer of Trustee Defendant
Date: November 04, 2019Plaintiff Windset Capital Corporation's Motion for Entry of an Order of Contempt
Date: June 30, 2020Plaintiff Windset Capital Corporation's Motion to Strike the Trustee Defendants Answer
Date: November 04, 2019Original civil Verified Complaint and Prayers for Injunctive Relief filed.
Date: May 26, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Charge Trustee Defendant (#30.0): ALLOWED Notices mailed 2/18/21 Judge: Frison, Hon. Shannon
Judge: Frison, Shannon |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Cohn, Esq., Lewis Jason (Attorney) on behalf of Windset Capital Corporation (Plaintiff) | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. Applies To: Cohn, Esq., Lewis Jason (Attorney) on behalf of Windset Capital Corporation (Plaintiff) | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing Applies To: Cohn, Esq., Lewis Jason (Attorney) on behalf of Windset Capital Corporation (Plaintiff) | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Windset Capital Corporation's Motion to Charge Trustee Defendant | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for entry of an order of contempt (#27.0): Other action taken MOOT. Trustee has filed Answer. (per moving party) | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Charge Trustee Defendant (#29.0): No Action Taken Motion should be filed in compliance with Rule 9A. No action at this time. Notices mailed 8/10/2020 Judge: Frison, Hon. Shannon
Judge: Frison, Shannon |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for entry of an order for contempt (#27.0): Other action taken Schedule for a hearing to determine whether additional proceedings under M.R.C.V.P. 65.3 are necessary | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Windset Capital Corporation's Motion to Charge Trustee Defendant | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Received from Trustee Defendant Pioneer Construction and Development Corp: Answer to original complaint; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.