Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Philbin, Mark T., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Berger, Esq., Howard M, against Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., represented by Martin Malone, Esq., Kelly, Smith-Corbally, Esq., Erin Kathleen Quill, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation with prejudice without interest or costs and with all rights of appeal being hereby waived. Applies To: Philbin, Mark T (Plaintiff); Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Defendant) | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.: Service through person in charge / agent; | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of extension of time Applies To: Philbin, Mark T (Plaintiff); Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Defendant) | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Erin Kathleen Quill Corbally, Esq. added for Defendant Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Kelly Martin Malone, Esq. added for Defendant Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Howard M Berger, Esq. added for Plaintiff Mark T. Philbin | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 05/24/2016 | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date William H Bentley, Esq. added for Plaintiff Mark T. Philbin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.