Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ireit Shrewsbury White City Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Maltby, Esq., Kevin Vincent, against Apple Spice Food Services, Ferguson, Kimberly, Ferguson, Scott E., in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of dismissal, Ireit Shrewsbury White City LLC failed to comply with an ORDER after review of the Docket dated 11/14/2018. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: the complaint is dismissed. Entered and Copies mailed 12/20/18 | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER sent for Status Review, if notice is not received by 12/14/2018 the complaint will be dismissed. | |
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Not Held Reason: Plaintiff Attorney(s) failed to appear | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Relief from Judgment of Dismissal (#9.0): ALLOWED Notices mailed 4/14/17 | |
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Ireit Shrewsbury White City LLC's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment and Assessment of Damages | |
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Kevin V. Maltby | |
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Talia K. Landry in Support of Paper # 9 | |
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Ireit Shrewsbury White City LLC's Motion for Relief from Judgment of Dismissal Pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 60 (B) | |
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of dismissal, Ireit Shrewsbury White City LLC failed to comply with an ORDER of the Court dated 02/03/2017. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: the complaint is dismissed for failure to file for default judgment. Entered and Copies mailed 3/17/17 | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Default (1-88): Defendant Ferguson, Scott E.: Defaulted under time standards; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.