Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bowers, Joshua, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Soto, Esq., Jonathan Neftali, against Remington Steel Inc, represented by Drapos, Esq., Philip Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Conference to Review Status scheduled for 07/21/2017 08:30 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice and without interest or costs, waiving all rights of appeal Applies To: Bowers, Joshua (Plaintiff); Remington Steel Inc (Defendant) | |
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons, returned INCOMPLETE unknown service Applies To: Remington Steel Inc (Defendant) | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Philip Alexander Drapos, Esq. added for Defendant Remington Steel Inc | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Remington Steel Inc: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 05/24/2016 | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Jonathan Neftali Soto, Esq. added for Plaintiff Joshua Bowers | |
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. | |
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.