Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Southworth -Milton Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Makynen, Esq., Michael R, against Case Iii, John E, J.E. Case Inc, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) | |
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Defendant Case III, John E: Defaulted by 55(a) request; | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Defendant J.E. Case Inc: Defaulted by 55(a) request; | |
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event | J.E. Case Inc, John E Case III's request for Default 55(a) Applies To: Southworth -Milton Inc Doing Business as Milton Cat (Plaintiff) | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Findings and Order for Approval of Plaintiff(s) Southworth -Milton Inc Doing Business as Milton Cat's Motion (#3.0) for a Real Estate Attachment as to Defendant(s) John E Case III In the amount of $30,000.00 | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for a Real Estate Attachment After review, (#3.0): ALLOWED | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Hearing on Equity Issue scheduled for 07/26/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled Reason: Defendant failed to appear | |
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant J.E. Case Inc: Service through person in charge / agent; | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 06/15/2016 14:06:21 | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Hearing on Equity Issue scheduled for 06/16/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: Request of Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.