Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Flannery, Esq., Patricia, against $1,278.00 In Us Currency, Pytel, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2016 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to File a Late Answer (#11.0): DENIED Without prejudice to serve/file pursuant to Superior Court Rule 9A. Notices mailed 2/27/17 | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Return Seized Money (#10.0): DENIED Without prejudice to serve/file pursuant to Superior Court Rule 9A. Notices mailed 2/27/17 | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Remove Default Judgment (#9.0): DENIED Without prejudice to serve/file pursuant to Superior Court Rule 9A. Notices mailed 2/27/17 | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant Kevin Pytel's Motion to File a Late Answer | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant Kevin Pytel's Motion to Return Seized Money | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant Kevin Pytel's Motion to remove Default Judgment | |
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Following an entry of Judgment by Default it is ordered that $1,278.00 In Us Currency be forfeited to Commonwealth of Massachusetts. Entered and Copies mailed 9/19/16 | |
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Default Judgment (#7.0): ALLOWED Notices mailed 9/19/16 | |
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts's Motion for Default Judgment | |
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Document: A Default order Mass. R. Civ. P. 55(a) was generated and sent to: Plaintiff: Patricia Flannery, Esq. Defendant: $1,278.00 In Us Currency |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.