Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Whidden, Kenneth, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Ventura, Esq., Peter John, against Chhangru Llc, Connor, Stacy, Connor, William, Leemilts Petroleum, Inc., Sutton Center Country Store Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Chesney, Esq., Stephanie M, Lysko, Esq., Gregg M, Smith, Esq., Michael J, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: May 20, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice and without interest or costs, waiving all rights of appeal, as to all counts and claims, counterclaims and crossclaims Applies To: Whidden, Kenneth (Plaintiff); Chhangru LLC Doing Business as Sutton Center Country Store (Defendant); Leemilts Petroleum, Inc. (Defendant); Connor, William (Defendant); Connor, Stacy (Defendant); Sutton Center Country Store LLC (Defendant) | |
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 06/08/2018 11:26:56 | |
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Extend Tracking Order (#17.0): ALLOWED Tracking order amended. Notices mailed 8/21/17 | |
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Kenneth Whidden's Joint Motion to extend tracking order | |
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Gregg M Lysko, Esq. added for Defendant Sutton Center Country Store LLC | |
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Gregg M Lysko, Esq. added for Defendant William Connor | |
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Gregg M Lysko, Esq. added for Defendant Stacy Connor | |
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Gregg M Lysko, Esq. added for Defendant Leemilts Petroleum, Inc. | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Sutton Center Country Store LLC. Served. Return receipt attached, service through person/agent in charge. Service on 05/16/2017. Applies To: Sutton Center Country Store LLC (Defendant) | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Stacy Connor. No Service. Return Receipt attached, signed by another individual. Applies To: Connor, Stacy (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.