We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Martello, Carolyn Vs. Genatossio, Philip

Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago ago

On May 19, 2016 a Commercial Paper case was filed by Martello, Carolyn, represented by Foley, Esq., Paul C, against Genatossio, Philip, represented by Kiritsy, Esq., George P, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA.

Case Details

Filing Date

May 19, 2016

Last Refreshed

May 10, 2021

Filing Location

Worcester County, MA

Judge

Connolly, Rosemary Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Contract / Business Cases

Parties

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Attorneys for Defendants

Case History

Type Description
Docket Event The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 06/18/2018 08:47:24
Docket Event Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 06/14/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: FTR - 2:17pm Hon. James G Reardon, Jr., Presiding Appeared: Staff: Laurie Jurgiel, Assistant Clerk Magistrate

Judge: James G Reardon, Jr.

Docket Event Plaintiff Carolyn Martello's Motion for Leave to Withdraw
Docket Event General correspondence regarding Court Received Letter from Defendant, Philip Genatossio, regarding releasing Attorney George P. Kiritsy as Attorney (See Attached)
Docket Event Event Result:: Hearing on Withdrawal of Attorney scheduled on: 09/18/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Rosemary Connolly, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Laurie Jurgiel, Assistant Clerk Magistrate

Judge: Connolly, Rosemary

Docket Event Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 09/18/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Rosemary Connolly, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Laurie Jurgiel, Assistant Clerk Magistrate

Judge: Connolly, Rosemary

Docket Event Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice Notices mailed on 08/23/18 Applies To: Martello, Carolyn (Plaintiff); Genatossio, Philip (Defendant)
Docket Event The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 08/02/2018 10:28:01
Docket Event The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 08/02/2018 10:27:09
Docket Event Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 09/06/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Rosemary Connolly, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Laurie Jurgiel, Assistant Clerk Magistrate

Judge: Connolly, Rosemary

See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.