Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Madelle, Nancy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fletcher, Esq., Christopher Davidson, Merrigan, Esq., James M, against Gignilliat, Aubree, represented by Buckley, Esq., Elaine Marie, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice and without costs Applies To: Madelle, Nancy (Plaintiff); Gignilliat, Aubree (Defendant) | |
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 09/29/2017 15:42:56 | |
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Defendant Aubree Gignilliat's Notice of Affidavit in Support of Medical Records | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Jury Demand Applies To: Gignilliat, Aubree (Defendant) | |
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Elaine Marie Buckley, Esq. added for Defendant Aubree Gignilliat | |
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Gignilliat, Aubree: Answer to original complaint; | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Gignilliat, Aubree: Service made at last and usual; | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 05/19/2016 | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Christopher Davidson Fletcher, Esq. added for Plaintiff Nancy Madelle | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date James M. Merrigan, Esq. added for Plaintiff Nancy Madelle |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.