Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Willins, Harriet, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Levy, Esq., Marc Jason, against Couming, Elaina L, represented by Anderson, Esq., Stephen R, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Original civil complaint filed and Demand for Jury Trial.
Date: May 19, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal The parties file this Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice without costs pursuant to M.R.Civ.P.Rule 41(a)(1)(ii). Applies To: Willins, Harriet (Plaintiff); Couming, Elaina L (Defendant) | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Stephen R Anderson, Esq. added for Defendant Elaina L Couming | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Couming, Elaina L: Answer to original complaint and Demand for a Trial by Jury. | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Couming, Elaina L: Service made in hand; | |
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Enlargement of Time to Effectuate Service and for Appointment of Special Process Server (#3.0): ALLOWED Notices mailed 8/10/16 | |
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Harriet Willins's Motion for Enlargement of time to effectuate service and for appointment of Special Process Server, Rick Wendling of Dunedin, FL. | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed and Demand for Jury Trial. | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 05/19/2016 | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Marc Jason Levy, Esq. added for Plaintiff Harriet Willins | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.