Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Arcade Properties Inc., filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by D'Amico, Esq., Howard B, against Resource Capital Llc, represented by Conrad, Esq., Jennifer Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2016 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of dismissal, Arcade Properties Inc. failed to comply with an ORDER after review of the Docket dated 12/29/2017. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: the complaint is dismissed. Entered and Copies mailed 2/16/18 | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER sent for Status Review, if notice is not received by 01/31/2018 the complaint will be dismissed. | |
August 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Status review notice returned Pending In Bankruptcy Court Applies To: Arcade Properties Inc. (Plaintiff) | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER sent for Status Review, if notice is not received by 09/11/2017 the complaint will be dismissed. | |
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Party Status: Defendant Resource Capital LLC: Inactive: Suggestion of Bankruptcy; | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Default (1-88): Defendant Resource Capital LLC: Defaulted under time standards; | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (#5.0): DENIED After hearing, and in consideration of the entire record of this case (filed today), the court finds as follows: Arcase was, at all times relevant, a commercial entity represented by counsel that negotiated with Resource (another represented commercial entity) two separate loans, and defaulted on them. In the aftermath, Arcade alleges (through various counts) that Resource demands an inflated amount under the note involved, that it "chilled" a commercially reasonable sale by contact with prospective buyer(s), and otherwise acted so unfairly and deceptively as to render this scenario one of "loan to own" the properties involved. The problem with these allegations is that they may be taken to show, at best, an actual controversy, but fall short of showing a likelihood of success on the merits. Added to this, is my conclusion that money damages would remedy the alleged wrongs, if proven. The core requirments of Packaging Indus. Group, Inc. v. Cheney, 380 Mass. 609, 616-17 (1980), necessary for injunctive relief, are therefore not met. Accordingly, this motion is DENIED. Notices mailed 5/20/16 | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Paper #5 filed by Resource Capital LLC Filed in Court | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Arcade Properties Inc.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Short Order of Notice (#4.0): ALLOWED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.