Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Northeast Products Co., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cohen, Esq., Alan Mark, against J.P. Sexton Llc, Perlroth, Davis, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with James Gavin Reardon, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Gavin Reardon, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 19, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Exemplified copy of the judgment sent to Attorney Alan Cohen LLC. | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for execution Applies To: Northeast Products Co. Also known as Northeast Products Company Also known as Northeast Products Co. Inc. (Plaintiff) | |
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER: /AMENDED JUDGMENT WITH CORRECTED INTEREST 1. Judgment Shall enter in favor of the Plaintiff Northeast Products Co a/k/a Northeast Products Company a/k/a Northeast Products CO., Inc. against defendant J.P. Sexton , LLC a/k/a JP Sexton LLC a/k/a Sexton LLC a/k/a JP Sexton and Davis Perlroth a/k/a Davis B. Perloh a/k/a David Perlroth on all counts in the principal sum of $40,140.00 together with contract interest at the rate of 18% per annum from dates of invoices as of December 1, 2016 in the Credit Application and Personal Guaranty in the amount of $18,479.66, reasonable attorney fees pursuant to Credit Application and Personal Guaranty in the amount of $5,799.00 and costs in the amount of $869.19 for a total judgment amount as of December 1, 2016 of $65,287.85 with Post-Judgment interest to accrue at the contract rate of 18% per annum. 2. The Clerk shall issue the execution forthwith. (see attached) (Entered and Copies mailed 03/15/2017) | |
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Amend Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(a) (#20.0): ALLOWED | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Northeast Products Co. Also known as Northeast Products Company Also known as Northeast Products Co. Inc.'s Memorandum in support of Motion to Amend Judgment | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Compliance and no opposition | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Northeast Products Co. Also known as Northeast Products Company Also known as Northeast Products Co. Inc.'s Motion to Amend Judgment | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Amended Memorandum of Damages | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)2 After Judicial Finding Presiding: Hon. James G Reardon, Jr. Judgment For: Northeast Products Co. Judgment Against: J.P. Sexton LLC Davis Perlroth Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 05/19/2016 Jdgmnt Date: 12/20/2016 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 40140.00 Other Costs: 869.19 Crt Ord Atty Fee: 5799.00 Judgment Total: 49,647.49 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.