Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Alex, Samuel, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Peters, Esq., Gary P, against Arrowstreet Inc., Berkeley Management Inc., Citysquare Ii Development Co. Llc, Consigli Construction Inc., Leggat Mccall Properties Llc, (total of 7) See All represented by Bussiere, Esq., Joseph S, Crowley, Esq., David J., Farrey Iii, Thomas B, Flanagan, Esq., Christopher P, Kavanagh, Esq., Eileen P, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with James Gavin Reardon, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Gavin Reardon, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 18, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Conference to Review Status scheduled for 07/21/2017 08:30 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to all claims, cross-claims, and third-party claims. All rights of appeal are hereby waived. Applies To: Alex, Samuel (Plaintiff); Consigli Construction Inc. (Defendant); Marguerite Concrete Contractors Inc (Defendant) | |
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal as to ONLY with prejudice without costs and waiving all rights of appeal. The action against Defendant Consigli Construction Co Inc and Third Party Defendant expressly remain open. Applies To: Alex, Samuel (Plaintiff); Worcester Renaissance C&D LLC (Defendant); Berkeley Management Inc. (Defendant) | |
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Separate and Final Judgment 54(b) By Clerk Presiding: Hon. James G Reardon, Jr. Judgment For: Samuel Alex Judgment Against: CitySquare II Development Co. LLC Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 05/18/2016 Jdgmnt Date: 01/27/2017 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 18000.00 Judgment Total: 19,504.19 Entered and Copies Mailed 1/27/17 | |
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal as to ONLY Arrowstreet Inc (AMENDED) Applies To: Alex, Samuel (Plaintiff); Arrowstreet Inc. (Defendant) | |
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to withdraw stipulation of dismissal (#28.0): ALLOWED Notices Mailed 1/10/17 | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for entry of separate and final judgment (#27.0): ALLOWED Notices Mailed 1/27/17 | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDED JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Separate and Final Judgment 54(b) After Hearing Presiding: Hon. David Ricciardone Judgment For: Samuel Alex Judgment Against: Leggat McCall Properties LLC Terms of Judgment: Judgement Date: 01/04/2017 Damages: Damage Amt: $32,000.00 Further Orders: Interest having been Waived Entered and Copies Mailed 1/4/2017 | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Separate and Final Judgment 54(b) By Clerk Presiding: Hon. David Ricciardone Judgment For: Samuel Alex Judgment Against: Leggat McCall Properties LLC Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 05/18/2016 Jdgmnt Date: 12/30/2016 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 32000.00 Judgment Total: 34,379.33 By Clerk, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: That the plaintiff named above recover of the defendant named above, the "JUDGMENT Total" with interest thereon as outlined below as provided by law, and its statutory costs of action. Entered and Copies Mailed 12/30/2016 | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for separate and final judgment (#26.0): ALLOWED ALLOWED without opposition and there being no just cause for delaying entry of judgment. Notices Mailed 12/30/2016 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.