Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Medero, Jose, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Beeler, Esq., Jeffrey S, against Community Habitat, Inc., Meadowbrook Village Associates, Lp, The Simon Companies Limited Partnership, represented by Gallagher, Esq., Michael W, Lee, Esq., Jay V, Mcnaught, Esq., Andrew D, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendants The Simon Companies Limited Partnership, Community Habitat, Inc., Jose Medero's Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Parties hereby stipulate that the plaintiff's claims against the defendants be dismissed with prejudice, without costs, and with all rights of appeal waived. Notices mailed on 12/8/17. Applies To: Medero, Jose (Plaintiff); The Simon Companies Limited Partnership (Defendant); Meadowbrook Village Associates, LP (Defendant); Community Habitat, Inc. (Defendant) | |
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Frison, Hon. Shannon The following event: Conference to Review Status scheduled for 01/05/2018 08:30 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled
Judge: Shannon The following event: Conference to Review Status scheduled for 01/05/2018 08:30 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case SettledFrison |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on motion to quash (#13.0): Joinder ALLOWED , no opposition. Notices mailed 8/14/17 | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on motion to quash (#11.0): After hearing, ALLOWED Subpoena is quashed. Ruling relates to this proceeding only and does not foreclose the plaintiff from pursuing an action against U.S. Legal in another forum and/or separate action. Notices mailed 8/14/17. | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Defendants' notice of joinder to emergency motion to quash, Filed in Court. Applies To: The Simon Companies Limited Partnership (Defendant); Meadowbrook Village Associates, LP (Defendant); Community Habitat, Inc. (Defendant) | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Opposition to to emergency motion to quash filed by Jose Medero, Filed in Court. | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Hearing for Protective Order scheduled for 08/11/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Carrie Cosenza in Support of Non-Party U.S. Legal Support, Inc.'s Motion to Quash, or in the Alternative, Motion for Protective Order. | |
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Non-Party / Case Participant U.S. Legal Support, Inc.'s EMERGENCY Motion to Quash Subpoena, or in the Alternative, Motion for Protective Order. | |
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Non-Party / Case Participant U.S. Legal Support, Inc.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of its EMERGENCY Motion to Quash Subpoena, or in the Alternative, Motion for Protective Order. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.