Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mcmahon, Christopher V., Rancourt, Justin, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Kazarian, Esq., Charles P, Kremer, Esq., Scott H, against Quinlan, Esq., Kevin D., represented by Conte, Esq., Daniel Robert, Grossbaum, Esq., David A, Quinlan, Esq., Kevin D, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: May 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal ( Joint ) with prejudice , without costs and with all rights of appeal waived. Notices mailed 07/21/2017 Applies To: McMahon, Christopher V. (Plaintiff); Rancourt, Justin (Plaintiff); Quinlan, Esq., Kevin D. (Defendant); Kremer, Esq., Scott H (Attorney) on behalf of McMahon, Christopher V., Rancourt, Justin (Plaintiff); Grossbaum, Esq., David A (Attorney) on behalf of Quinlan, Esq., Kevin D. (Defendant); Kazarian, Esq., Charles P (Attorney) on behalf of McMahon, Christopher V., Rancourt, Justin (Plaintiff); Malloy, Esq., Christopher (Attorney) on behalf of McMahon, Christopher V., Rancourt, Justin (Plaintiff); Quinlan, Esq., Kevin D (Attorney) on behalf of Quinlan, Esq., Kevin D. (Defendant); Conte, Esq., Daniel Robert (Attorney) on behalf of Quinlan, Esq., Kevin D. (Defendant) | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Scott H Kremer, Esq. added for Plaintiff Justin Rancourt | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Scott H Kremer, Esq. added for Plaintiff Christopher V. McMahon | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Christopher Malloy, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Plaintiff Justin Rancourt | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Christopher Malloy, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Plaintiff Christopher V. McMahon | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Daniel Robert Conte, Esq. added for Defendant Kevin D. Quinlan, Esq. | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date David A Grossbaum, Esq. added for Defendant Kevin D. Quinlan, Esq. | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Quinlan, Esq., Kevin D.: Answer to original complaint; | |
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Kevin D. Quinlan, Esq. added for Defendant Kevin D. Quinlan, Esq. | |
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Quinlan, Esq., Kevin D.: Answer to original complaint; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.