Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mcbride, Tammy, Mcbride, William T, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by O'Brien, Jr., Esq., James D, against Doe, John, Figueroa, Henry, Tighe Warehousing And Distribution Inc, represented by Bosse, Esq., Peter L, Signoracci, Esq., Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Ritter, William J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRitter, William J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 10, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Affidavit of Counsel in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement
Date: July 30, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal The parties stipulate that the action be dismissed with prejudice as to Defendants, Henry Figueroa and Tighe Warehousing and Distribution Inc. Notices mailed on 9/12/18. Applies To: McBride, William T (Plaintiff); McBride, Tammy (Plaintiff); Tighe Warehousing and Distribution Inc (Defendant); Figueroa, Henry (Defendant) | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 09/10/2018 Judge: Mulqueen, Hon. Jane E
Judge: Jane EMulqueen |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: James D O'Brien, Jr., Esq. Attorney: Peter L Bosse, Esq. Attorney: Anthony Signoracci, Esq. | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Counsel in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for approval of Settlement (#14.0): ALLOWED After hearing, I find the settlement is fair and reasonable and Allow the Motion to approve settlement. notices mailed 08/07/2018 Judge: Ritter, Hon. William J
Judge: William JRitter |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs William T McBride, Tammy McBride's Assented to Motion for Approval of Settlement (filed in court) | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 08/14/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Jane E Mulqueen, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Anne O'Connor, Assistant Clerk
Judge: Mulqueen, Jane E |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Proposed Settlement scheduled on: 07/30/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: Courtroom 19 FTR (2:06pm) Hon. William J Ritter, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Gail Dempsey, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Judge: Ritter, Hon. William J
Judge: Ritter, William J |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 06/19/2018 11:51:42 | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on motion to compel Production of Documents (#13.0): Upon review, ALLOWED Defendant to produce documents within 10 days of ruling. Notices mailed 6/23/17. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.