Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Trustees Of The Cady Brook Crossing Condominium Trust, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Aronson, Esq., Janet Oulousian, against Merchant, Gypsy, Ricardi, Joseph D, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeLiens |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) without prejudice. Notices mailed 4/22/14 | |
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendants Joseph D Ricardi, Gypsy Merchant, NationStar Mortgage LLC, & Unifund Corporation. A motion for an assessment of damages and default judgment pursuant to Mass.R.Civ.P.55(b)2 and subject to Mass.R.Civ.P.54(b) and 55(b)4 as amended by 3/12/14. Copies mailed 2/11/2014 | |
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Joseph D Ricardi, Gypsy Merchant, NationStar Mortgage LLC, & Unifund Corporation by Trustees of the Cady Brook Crossing Condominium Trust | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with long-arm statute with proof of service on out of state defendant NationStar Mortgage LLC, & Unifund Corporation | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Deft Gypsy Merchant, service made on 1/13/2014 (last and usual) | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Deft Joseph D Ricardi, service made on 1/13/2014 (last and usual) | |
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid in the amount of $275.00 including $15.00 surcharge and $20.00 security fee. | |
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type C05, Track X. | |
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint & civil action cover sheet and Rule 29 Statement filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.