Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
K&K Acoustical Ceilings Inc, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Hurwitz, Esq., Robert W, against Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Northbrook Village Ii Inc, Barr Inc, represented by Rodowicz, Jr., Esq., Joseph S, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Janet Kenton-Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet Kenton-Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2014 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of dismissal; failure to comply with Default rder dated 6/19/2014. (James R. Lemire, Justice (RAJ)) Copies mailed 7/23/2014 | |
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Default (1-88) re: Barr Inc, Northbrook Village II Inc, Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Motion for default judgment and assement to be filed by 07/19/14 or complaint dismissed. | |
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Atty Joseph S. Rodowicz, Jr.'s notice of appearance for Barr Inc, Hartford Fire Insurance Company | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Barr Inc(Defendant) service made on 4/3/2014 (agent, person in charge) | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#5) ALLOWED (Janet Kenton-Walker, Justice) Notices mailed 4/17/2014 | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiff K & K Acoustical Ceilings Inc's MOTION to Vacate judgment of dismissal of Barr, Inc. | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Defendant Northbrook Village II Inc's Notice of intent to file motion | |
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL (SON 1-88) re: Barr Inc; service not complete by deadline | |
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Northbrook Village II Inc(Defendant) Service made on 3/20/14 Agent | |
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Hartford Fire Insurance Company(Defendant) Service made on 3/20/14 Certified Mail; Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.