Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Degraff, John, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Atwater, Esq., Erin Ashley, against Tri-Star Plastic Corp, represented by Slater, Esq., Matthew A, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2014 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event | The parties of the above entitled action, to MRCP 41(a)(1)(ii), hereby stipulate that said action be dismissed with prejudice, without costs to either party. All rights of appeal waived. | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Tri-Star Plastic Corp(Defendant) & cj. | |
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Tri-Star Plastic Corp(Defendant) Service made on 1/9/14 Agent/Person in Charge | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#2) ALLOWED (Robert B. Gordon, Justice) Notices mailed 1/8/2014 | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiff John DeGraff's MOTION for appointment of special process server Michelle DiBenedetto | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid in the amount of $275.00 including $15.00 surcharge and $20.00 security fee. | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type B04, Track F. | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint & civil action cover sheet and Rule 29 Statement filed- CJ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.