Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pham, Thao, filed a(n) Torts case represented by Gentile, Esq., Cherele L, against Amica Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Barry, Esq., James W, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wrenn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wrenn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2014 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Conference to Review Status scheduled for 04/25/2016 08:30 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs as to Amica Mutual Insurance Company's | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Amica Mutual Insurance Company(Defendant) | |
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Amica Mutual Insurance Company(Defendant) service made 01/13/2014 ( agent ) | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#2) ALLOWED (Daniel M. Wrenn, Justice) Notices mailed 1/10/2014 (Attest: Matthew Lefebvre, Asst Clerk) | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Thao Pham's MOTION for appointment of special process server Francis J Trapasso and/or Agents | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid in the amount of $275.00 including $15.00 surcharge and $20.00 security fee. | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type B05, Track A. | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Applicantion for Appointment of Arbitrator Complaint & civil action cover sheet filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.