Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Code Genesys Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Speranza, Esq., Jack David, Perruzzi, Esq., Christopher A, against Denville Partners Llc, Ford, Jason, represented by Taylor, Esq., Phil A, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2014 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of dismissal: failure to comply with nisi order It is ORDERED & ADJUDGED: that the Complaint & all claims be and hereby are dismissed under MRCP 41(b)(1) withotu prejudice. (Robert B. Gordon, Justice). Copies mailed 10/10/2014 | |
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 9/21/2014 (James R. Lemire, Justice (RAJ)) | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#11) Withdrawn at the request of moving party (John S. McCann, Justice). Notices mailed 6/13/2014 | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#12) Settled - 60 day order (John S. McCann, Justice). Notices mailed 6/13/2014 | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 8/14/2014 (John S. McCann, Justice) Copies mailed 6/13/14 | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | FAXED -Emergency Motion of the Plaintiff Code Genesys LLC for leave of court that Jack Speranza Esq Conduct the deposition of the Defendant Jason Folrd and for sanction/Costs ; Memo in support | |
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Code Genesys LLC by Jason Ford, Denville Partners LLC | |
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Amended ANSWER: Jason Ford | |
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Amended ANSWER: Denville Partners LLC | |
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Jason Ford(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.