Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rudolph, Esq., Alexander H, Homoleski, Esq., Kristina L, Hemingway, Esq., Anne Lark, Desrochers, Esq., Gina Marie, Cox, Esq., Aaron, (total of 6) See All against Isgro, Sebastian, represented by Amorello, Esq., Robert E, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2014 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Endorsement on motion for execution to issue late (#13.0): (after 1 year) ALLOWED upon review . | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A certificate of service Applies To: Cach LLC (Plaintiff) | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION to issue EXECUTION after one year Applies To: Cach LLC (Plaintiff) | |
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for execution Applies To: Cach LLC (Plaintiff) | |
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Agreement for Judgment. It is hereby agreed that judgment may be entered in this action for Cach LLC, Plaintiff herein, against Sebastian Isgro aka Sebastian D. Isgro, defendant herein, in the sum of $42,802.83, and with interest in the amount of $576.84, totalling $43,379.67. Execution to issue filed in court. Copies mailed 9/12/14 | |
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#10) ALLOWED. The assessment of damages hearing is rescheduled for 7/17/14 @ 2PM (Brian A. Davis, Justice) Notices mailed 6/19/2014 | |
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Assented To MOTION to Continue | |
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#9) ALLOWED. The assessment of damages hearing is continued to 6/26/14 @ 2PM (Brian A. Davis, Justice) Notices mailed 6/10/2014 | |
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Assented-To MOTION to Continue (faxed) | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#8) ALLOWED (Brian A. Davis, Justice) Notices mailed 4/16/2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.