Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fisher, David, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Rodriguez, Esq., Jenny Maria, Gardner, Esq., Joshua William, against Ocwen Loan Servicing Llc, represented by Lake, Esq., Hale Y, Fabella, Esq., Justin Mark, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Janet Kenton-Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet Kenton-Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2014 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC(Defendant) | |
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation extending time to respond to complaint and 93A demand letter up and including July 7, 2014 | |
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#7) ALLOWED (Janet Kenton-Walker, Justice) Notices mailed 5/13/2014 | |
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Joint Stipulation to extend time deft to file an answer/responsive pleading to the complaint and 93A Demand Letter to and including 6/4/2014 | |
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Joint Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint | |
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation of the parties to extime for the deft. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC time to respond to complaint up to and inc. 4/4/14 | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of 93A complaint sent to Attorney General | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | First Amended complaint of David Fisher | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC(Defendant) Service made on 12/30/13 Agent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.