Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Picard, Heath J, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mcmaster, Esq., John J, against Mallett, Charmaine M, represented by Tilley, Esq., John, Piccirilli, Esq., Dawn M, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wrenn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wrenn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Heath J Picard's original complaint appeal waived. | |
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Conference to Review Status scheduled for 09/16/2016 08:30 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Conference to Review Status scheduled for 07/15/2016 08:30 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Not Held Reason: By Court prior to date | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 07/11/2016 | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: John J McMaster, Esq. Attorney: Dawn M Piccirilli, Esq. Attorney: John Tilley, Esq. | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Jury Trial scheduled for 06/06/2016 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Not Held Reason: Case Settled | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Final Trial Conference scheduled for 05/24/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 04/25/2016 11:28:32 | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Final Trial Conference scheduled for 06/02/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: By Court prior to date | |
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Supplemental Opposition to the defendants Motion for a rule 35 examination |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.