Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Schultz, Sarah E, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Paterniti, Esq., Richard Warren, Jones, Esq., Patrick T, against Koury, Frederick M, represented by Anderson, Esq., Stephen R, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with David Ricciardone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Ricciardone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2014 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs | |
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#4) ALLOWED (David Ricciardone, Justice) Notices mailed 3/13/2014 | |
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Defendant Frederick M Koury's MOTION to order release of medical records, Statement of reasons and authorities in support of motion, Affidavit of compliance under Rule 9A, Document listing, & cert of service | |
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Deft Frederick M Koury- CJ | |
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Deft Frederick M Koury, service made on 12/20/2013 (last and usual) | |
December 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid in the amount of $275.00 including $15.00 surcharge and $20.00 security fee. | |
December 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type B03, Track F. | |
December 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint & civil action cover sheet and Rule 29 Statement filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.