Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cabana, George L, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mason, Esq., Christopher C, against Wood, Paulette R, represented by Russell, Esq., Julie Bednarz, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wrenn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wrenn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2014 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs as to Paulette R Wood's waiving all rights of appeal. | |
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Status Review scheduled for 05/22/2015 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled Appeared: | |
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 5/18/2015 (Daniel M. Wrenn, Justice) Copies mailed 3/20/15 | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 4/2/2015 | |
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#7) There being no opposition, this motion is ALLOWED (Brian A. Davis, Justice) Notices mailed 6/6/2014 | |
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#6) There being no opposition, this motion is ALLOWED (Brian A. Davis, Justice) Notices mailed 6/6/2014 | |
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Defendant Paulette R Wood's MOTION for Order for Copies of Medical Records (for Plaintiff from Harrington Hospital); Brief in Support Filed; Certificate of Service; Affidavit of Compliance; Notice of Filing; | |
June 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Defendant Paulette R Wood's MOTION for Order for Copies of Medical Records(for Plaintiff from Fairlawn Rehabilitation Hospital); Brief in Support Filed; Certificate of Service | |
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#4) ALLOWED (Daniel M. Wrenn, Justice) Notices mailed 3/11/2014 | |
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Defendant Paulette Wood's Motion for Order for copies of Medical records; Affidvit of compliance; Notice of filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.