Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kingdom Associates, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Asselta, Esq., Joseph Patrick, against Peterson, Ronald, Peterson Attachments Inc, represented by George, Esq., Robert A, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2014 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs to either party as against the other. | |
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Atty Robert A George's notice of appearance for Peterson Attachments Inc, Ronald Peterson | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Default judgmnt (55b1) by clerk v defendants Peterson Attachments Inc, Ronald Peterson in amount of $46,450.00 plus interest from 12/11/2013 in the sum of $3,665.13 and its costs of action. Copies mailed 8/12/2014 | |
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk for default judgment (55b1) re: Peterson Attachments Inc, Ronald Peterson by Kingdom Associates ; Affirmation in Support | |
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendants Peterson Attachments Inc, Ronald Peterson. A motion for an assessment of damages and default judgment pursuant to Mass.R.Civ.P.55(b)2 and subject to Mass.R.Civ.P.54(b) and 55(b)4 as amended by 8/21/2014. Copies mailed 7/24/2014 | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Peterson Attachments Inc, Ronald Peterson by Kingdom Associates | |
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Peterson Attachments Inc(Defendant) 1/9/14 (agent, person in charge at time of service) | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Ronald Peterson(Defendant) 12-20-13 (last and usual) | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of 93A complaint sent to Attorney General | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid in the amount of $275.00 including $15.00 surcharge and $20.00 security fee. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.