Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kent, Brian, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Salerno, Esq., Anthony M, against Gero, Brian, represented by Gilson, Esq., George T, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2013 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of Dismissal: Failure to comply with nisi order. It is Ordered and Adjudged: that any and all remaining claims are dismissed without prejudice. Entered and copies mailed 10/26/15 Applies To: Gilson, Esq., George T (Attorney) on behalf of Gero, Brian (Defendant); Salerno, Esq., Anthony M (Attorney) on behalf of Kent, Brian (Plaintiff) | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Conference to Review Status scheduled for 10/23/2015 08:30 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Anthony M Salerno, Esq. Attorney: George T Gilson, Esq. | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 10/22/2015 | |
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Jury Trial scheduled for 09/08/2015 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled Appeared: | |
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Jury Trial scheduled for 05/11/2015 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Not Held Reason: Joint request of parties Appeared: | |
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Brian Gero's affidavit of written notice of intent to offer medical bills as evidence, pursuant to MGLc 233, sec 79G | |
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Defendant's Supplement to Joint Pretrial Memo | |
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#5) It is hereby ORDERED that: (1) the Plaintiff shall submit to a medical examination by the Defendant's expert, Charles Kenny, M.D., at a mutually convenient time and place within ninety (90) days of the date of this decision; and (2) the Defendant shall serve the Plaintiff with supplemental expert disclosures describing in reasonable detail Dr. Kenny s anticipated trial testimony and the grounds therefore within thirty (30) days after such examination. (Brian A. Davis, Justice). Notices mailed 6/12/2014 | |
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Joint pre-trial memorandum filed in court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.